LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB795
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB795
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB795
Compare Versions
SB795 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB795 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB795 Amended July 15, 2015
SB795 Amended June 29, 2015
SB795 Amended June 18, 2015
SB795 Amended June 1, 2015
SB795 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB795 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB795 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB795 Amended July 15, 2015
SB795 Amended June 29, 2015
SB795 Amended June 18, 2015
SB795 Amended June 1, 2015
SB795 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare