Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1028.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|