LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB799
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB799
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB799
Compare Versions
SB799 Amended August 30, 2016
SB799 Amended August 20, 2015
SB799 Amended June 25, 2015
SB799 Amended April 20, 2015
SB799 Introduced March 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB799 Amended August 30, 2016
SB799 Amended August 20, 2015
SB799 Amended June 25, 2015
SB799 Amended April 20, 2015
SB799 Introduced March 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare