California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016
Bill February 12, 2016