LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB812
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB812
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB812
Compare Versions
SB812 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB812 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB812 Amended August 18, 2016
SB812 Amended August 15, 2016
SB812 Amended June 29, 2016
SB812 Amended June 21, 2016
SB812 Amended June 16, 2016
SB812 Amended May 31, 2016
SB812 Amended April 27, 2016
SB812 Amended April 12, 2016
SB812 Amended March 17, 2016
SB812 Amended February 12, 2016
SB812 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB812 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB812 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB812 Amended August 18, 2016
SB812 Amended August 15, 2016
SB812 Amended June 29, 2016
SB812 Amended June 21, 2016
SB812 Amended June 16, 2016
SB812 Amended May 31, 2016
SB812 Amended April 27, 2016
SB812 Amended April 12, 2016
SB812 Amended March 17, 2016
SB812 Amended February 12, 2016
SB812 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare