|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 778, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6231.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3576.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3192.) (March 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Set for hearing March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|