LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB819
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB819
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB819
Compare Versions
SB819 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB819 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB819 Amended June 28, 2016
SB819 Amended June 15, 2016
SB819 Amended March 15, 2016
SB819 Introduced January 5, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB819 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB819 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB819 Amended June 28, 2016
SB819 Amended June 15, 2016
SB819 Amended March 15, 2016
SB819 Introduced January 5, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare