Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5546.) Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6477.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6329.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 5982.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3538.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|