California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB831 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill August 23, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill June 10, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016