|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 5881.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|