California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB869 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill May 18, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016