|
07/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 30. Page 5573.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5473.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 3900.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3888.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3887.) (May 16)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|