LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB880
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB880
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB880
Compare Versions
SB880 Chaptered July 1, 2016
SB880 Enrolled June 30, 2016
SB880 Amended May 17, 2016
SB880 Amended March 28, 2016
SB880 Introduced January 15, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB880 Chaptered July 1, 2016
SB880 Enrolled June 30, 2016
SB880 Amended May 17, 2016
SB880 Amended March 28, 2016
SB880 Introduced January 15, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare