California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB884 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016