LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB884
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB884
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB884
Compare Versions
SB884 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB884 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB884 Amended August 1, 2016
SB884 Amended June 30, 2016
SB884 Amended May 31, 2016
SB884 Amended April 13, 2016
SB884 Amended March 17, 2016
SB884 Introduced January 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB884 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB884 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB884 Amended August 1, 2016
SB884 Amended June 30, 2016
SB884 Amended May 31, 2016
SB884 Amended April 13, 2016
SB884 Amended March 17, 2016
SB884 Introduced January 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare