Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 4090.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
May 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3593.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|