California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB886 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016