|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5948.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3927.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Roth.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3420.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|