California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016