|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2502.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1286.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|