LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB9
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB9
Compare Versions
SB9 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB9 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB9 Amended September 1, 2015
SB9 Amended August 17, 2015
SB9 Amended July 16, 2015
SB9 Amended July 7, 2015
SB9 Amended July 2, 2015
SB9 Amended June 23, 2015
SB9 Amended June 2, 2015
SB9 Amended May 5, 2015
SB9 Amended April 15, 2015
SB9 Amended March 24, 2015
SB9 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB9 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB9 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB9 Amended September 1, 2015
SB9 Amended August 17, 2015
SB9 Amended July 16, 2015
SB9 Amended July 7, 2015
SB9 Amended July 2, 2015
SB9 Amended June 23, 2015
SB9 Amended June 2, 2015
SB9 Amended May 5, 2015
SB9 Amended April 15, 2015
SB9 Amended March 24, 2015
SB9 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare