|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 780, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 5895.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Obernolte. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3926.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|