LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB918
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB918
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB918
Compare Versions
SB918 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB918 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB918 Amended June 16, 2016
SB918 Amended May 10, 2016
SB918 Amended April 7, 2016
SB918 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB918 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB918 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB918 Amended June 16, 2016
SB918 Amended May 10, 2016
SB918 Amended April 7, 2016
SB918 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare