California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 18, 2016