LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB923
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB923
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB923
Compare Versions
SB923 Chaptered August 25, 2016
SB923 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB923 Amended May 31, 2016
SB923 Amended May 18, 2016
SB923 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB923 Chaptered August 25, 2016
SB923 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB923 Amended May 31, 2016
SB923 Amended May 18, 2016
SB923 Introduced January 28, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare