|
07/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 5517.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3576.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|