California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016