Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4000.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|