LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB942
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB942
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB942
Compare Versions
SB942 Amended August 1, 2016
SB942 Amended June 15, 2016
SB942 Amended May 31, 2016
SB942 Amended April 19, 2016
SB942 Amended March 31, 2016
SB942 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB942 Amended August 1, 2016
SB942 Amended June 15, 2016
SB942 Amended May 31, 2016
SB942 Amended April 19, 2016
SB942 Amended March 31, 2016
SB942 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare