California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB945 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016