LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB945
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB945
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB945
Compare Versions
SB945 Chaptered September 14, 2016
SB945 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB945 Amended August 1, 2016
SB945 Amended June 9, 2016
SB945 Amended April 25, 2016
SB945 Amended March 29, 2016
SB945 Amended March 7, 2016
SB945 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB945 Chaptered September 14, 2016
SB945 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB945 Amended August 1, 2016
SB945 Amended June 9, 2016
SB945 Amended April 25, 2016
SB945 Amended March 29, 2016
SB945 Amended March 7, 2016
SB945 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare