|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6058.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4038.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4000.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3610.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3497.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|