California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB950 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill June 29, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016