|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3627.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3580.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|