California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB952 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/19/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 952CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 150 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 19, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 19, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 21, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Anderson FEBRUARY 4, 2016 An act to amend Section 4202 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 952, Anderson. Pharmacy technicians: licensure requirements. The Pharmacy Law provides for the licensure and regulation of pharmacists and pharmacy technicians by the California State Board of Pharmacy. Existing law authorizes the California State Board of Pharmacy to issue a pharmacy technician license to an individual if that individual is a high school graduate or possesses a general educational development certificate equivalent and has obtained an associate's degree in pharmacy technology, completed a specified course of training, graduated from a specified school of pharmacy, or is certified by the Pharmacy Technician Certification Board. This bill would substitute for the Pharmacy Technician Certification Board a pharmacy technician certifying organization offering a pharmacy technician certification program accredited by the National Commission for Certifying Agencies that is approved by the California State Board of Pharmacy. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4202 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4202. (a) The board may issue a pharmacy technician license to an individual if he or she is a high school graduate or possesses a general educational development certificate equivalent, and meets any one of the following requirements: (1) Has obtained an associate's degree in pharmacy technology. (2) Has completed a course of training specified by the board. (3) Has graduated from a school of pharmacy recognized by the board. (4) Is certified by a pharmacy technician certifying organization offering a pharmacy technician certification program accredited by the National Commission for Certifying Agencies that is approved by the board. (b) The board shall adopt regulations pursuant to this section for the licensure of pharmacy technicians and for the specification of training courses as set out in paragraph (2) of subdivision (a). Proof of the qualifications of any applicant for licensure as a pharmacy technician shall be made to the satisfaction of the board and shall be substantiated by any evidence required by the board. (c) The board shall conduct a criminal background check of the applicant to determine if an applicant has committed acts that would constitute grounds for denial of licensure, pursuant to this chapter or Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 480) of Division 1.5. (d) The board may suspend or revoke a license issued pursuant to this section on any ground specified in Section 4301. (e) Once an individual is licensed as a pharmacist, the pharmacy technician registration is no longer valid and the pharmacy technician license shall be returned to the board within 15 days.