|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5513.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4039.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4000.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
May 27 set for first hearing. Held in committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3335.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|