LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB955
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB955
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB955
Compare Versions
SB955 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB955 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB955 Amended August 1, 2016
SB955 Amended June 23, 2016
SB955 Amended June 22, 2016
SB955 Amended April 26, 2016
SB955 Amended April 4, 2016
SB955 Amended March 28, 2016
SB955 Introduced February 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB955 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB955 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB955 Amended August 1, 2016
SB955 Amended June 23, 2016
SB955 Amended June 22, 2016
SB955 Amended April 26, 2016
SB955 Amended April 4, 2016
SB955 Amended March 28, 2016
SB955 Introduced February 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare