|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 674, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5446.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6241.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4095.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4000.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|