California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB968 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016