|
08/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3799.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|