California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016