|
08/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5705.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3700.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|