California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB983 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016