California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016