LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB984
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB984
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB984
Compare Versions
SB984 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB984 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB984 Amended August 15, 2016
SB984 Amended June 30, 2016
SB984 Amended May 31, 2016
SB984 Introduced February 10, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB984 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB984 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB984 Amended August 15, 2016
SB984 Amended June 30, 2016
SB984 Amended May 31, 2016
SB984 Introduced February 10, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare