Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 36.) (August 19). | ||
Senate | 08/06/2015 | Set for hearing August 19. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. To print. |