LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX11
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX11
Compare Versions
SBX11 Amended August 29, 2016
SBX11 Amended August 24, 2016
SBX11 Amended April 21, 2016
SBX11 Amended September 1, 2015
SBX11 Amended August 25, 2015
SBX11 Amended July 14, 2015
SBX11 Introduced June 22, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SBX11 Amended August 29, 2016
SBX11 Amended August 24, 2016
SBX11 Amended April 21, 2016
SBX11 Amended September 1, 2015
SBX11 Amended August 25, 2015
SBX11 Amended July 14, 2015
SBX11 Introduced June 22, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare