|
05/04/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 175.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 51.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 37.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2015
|
Set for hearing August 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 28.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2015
|
Set for hearing August 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. To print.
|
|
|