LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX27
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX27
Compare Versions
SBX27 Chaptered May 4, 2016
SBX27 Enrolled April 19, 2016
SBX27 Amended March 2, 2016
SBX27 Amended February 29, 2016
SBX27 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SBX27 Chaptered May 4, 2016
SBX27 Enrolled April 19, 2016
SBX27 Amended March 2, 2016
SBX27 Amended February 29, 2016
SBX27 Introduced July 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare