Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | July 14 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2015 | Set for hearing July 14. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A., and RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |